Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Retirement Income Subtraction Modifications and Senior Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Delegates B. Barnes, Attar, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Boteler, C. Branch, Buckel, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, Griffith, Guyton, Hartman, Hornberger, Ivey, D. Jones, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Patterson, Rose, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for individuals who are at least 55 years old for the first $15,000 of income from a certain employee retirement system that is attributable to the individual's employment as a public safety employee; providing that retirement income of public safety employees that is included in the subtraction allowed under the Act may not be taken into account for purposes of a Maryland income tax subtraction modification for certain retirement income; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Public Safety Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {953825/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2022 2/26/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Public Safety Retirement Income
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {753829/1 Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Floor Amendment {953825/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Retirement Income Subtraction Modifications and Senior Credit
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Referred Rules 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Retirement Income Subtraction Modifications and Senior Credit
Age
Last Updated: 7/27/2022 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page