Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining "qualified distressed county" for purposes of expanding eligibility for certain credits and benefits under the More Jobs for Marylanders Program.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1104
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {685368/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments {685368/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page