Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Afzali, D. Barnes, Ciliberti, Frush, McDonough, McMillan, Sanchez, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain rights granted to members of the Maryland National Guard under the Act are in addition to the rights granted by federal law; establishing that the intent of the Act is to supplement certain rights and protections provided by a certain federal statute; authorizing a certain service member to terminate a certain contract at a certain time under certain circumstances; providing for the method by which a certain service member may terminate a certain contract; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief
(   13-704, 13-704.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page