Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson, Ali, Brooks, Glenn, Gutierrez, C. Howard, Jalisi, Lafferty, R. Lewis, and Sanchez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a certain applicant or licensee is subject to a certain minority business participation goal established by the Special Secretary for the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; requiring a certain certification agency, in consultation with the General Assembly and the Office of the Attorney General, to study the Minority Business Enterprise Program to evaluate the program's compliance with certain requirements and to report to the Legislative Policy Committee by December 14, 2018; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0383
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {555266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {555266/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text - Chapter - Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page