Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Opposing certain inspection rules promulgated by the U.S. Department of Agriculture that have drastically impeded the harvest and sale of blue catfish and thus rendered the State unable to adequately use the commercial harvest as a form of control over the invasive blue catfish species; urging the U.S. Congress to amend 21 U.S.C. § 601(w) to exempt the wild catch of domestic catfish from certain inspection requirements; and requiring a copy of the Resolution to be forwarded to certain elected officials.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0004
Introduced in a prior session as: HJ0003 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/25/2020
Legislative Date
9/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/25/2020 9/25/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Referred Rules 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page