Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund – No–Cost Licenses and Stamps
Sponsored by
Delegate Thiam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an eligible sponsor organization providing recreational opportunities with grant funding from the Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund to provide at no cost an angler's license and trout stamps, a Chesapeake Bay and coastal sport fishing license, or a hunting license and any corresponding stamps to certain persons.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0665
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0755 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources – Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund – No–Cost Licenses and Stamps
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund – No–Cost Licenses and Stamps
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund – No–Cost Licenses and Stamps
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page