Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Acevero, Charles, Foley, Henson, Landis, Proctor, Ruth, Terrasa, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Green Infrastructure Rebate Program to provide property owners the incentive to invest in stormwater management practices-; requiring the Department of the Environment to administer the Program in collaboration with each county that elects to participate in the Program; authorizing the Department to delegate authority to administer the Program to a participating county; and requiring the Department and participating counties to provide a certain percentage of the cost of a rebate under the Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
(   4-1001 through 4-1008, 9-320   )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:41 PM
Click to return on the top page