Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Sydnor, Beidle, Feldman, Griffith, Hayes, Hettleman, Kelley, Lam, Patterson, Waldstreicher, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a certain new unit to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, in each of fiscal years 2023 through 2032, to include in the annual State operating budget $57,700,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; specifying the purpose and uses of the Fund; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0001
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1043 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 6 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-214, 11-206.3, 15-126, 15-127 )
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 2:42 PM