Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - The Senator Delores G. Kelley Scholarship Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Senator Delores G. Kelley Scholarship Program for students who are eligible to receive the maximum federal Pell Grant and are residents of counties participating in the Program or are graduates of high schools in participating counties to receive a scholarship to be used at historically Black colleges and universities; requiring counties participating in the Program to provide an equal match to the State scholarship amount awarded under the Program to each recipient from that county; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/18/2022
Legislative Date
11/18/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2023
Legislative Date
1/13/2023
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/18/2022 11/18/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Higher Education - The Senator Delores G. Kelley Scholarship Program - Establishment
Senate 1/13/2023 1/13/2023 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
(   18-3901 through 18-3906 )
Last Updated: 1/31/2023 4:43 PM
Click to return on the top page