Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson, Ellis, Carozza, Pinsky, Kagan, Jackson, Lam, Hester, Gallion, Washington, Reilly, Simonaire, Watson, Lee, Sydnor, and Hettleman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the fourth Thursday in March as Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day through appropriate and informative programs and activities.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0479
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0303 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723925/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Watson) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {633529/1 (Senator Watson) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {723925/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Watson) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {723925/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Floor Amendment {633529/1 (Senator Watson) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Text - Chapter - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page