Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Dwelling House of Disabled Veterans - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Gile, Beidle, Carozza, Klausmeier, Simonaire, Smith, and Hester
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax on the dwelling house of certain disabled veterans to include individuals who have been declared by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs to have a nonpermanent service-connected disability of 100% that results from blindness or any other disabling cause that was not caused or incurred by misconduct of the veteran; altering the criteria for determining the amount of the credit; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0063
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2023
Legislative Date
9/29/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2024
Legislative Date
1/09/2024
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323929/1
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Ellis) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2023 9/29/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit for Dwelling House of Disabled Veterans - Alterations
Senate 1/09/2024 1/09/2024 Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments {323929/1 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Committee Amendment Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Ellis) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax - Credit for Dwelling House of Disabled Veterans - Alterations
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:28 AM
Click to return on the top page