Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Residential Leases – Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a landlord to make a certain disclosure to prospective tenants if the landlord uses a ratio utility billing system; making a certain lease provision unenforceable if the landlord fails to make the disclosure; requiring a landlord to document a bill for certain utilities; providing that a tenant organization has the right of free assembly during reasonable hours and on reasonable notice to the landlord; expanding certain provisions of law regarding the rights of certain tenants to include certain victims of stalking; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0086
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0967 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/14/2021
Legislative Date
9/14/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973528/1
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973528/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {173821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-28)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/14/2021 9/14/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Residential Leases – Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2022)
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {973528/1 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {973528/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Substitute Committee Amendment {173821/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant – Residential Leases – Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2022)
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (107-28) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Text - Chapter - Landlord and Tenant – Residential Leases – Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2022)
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:34 PM
Click to return on the top page