Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Board, Fees, and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the composition of the State Board of On-Site Wastewater Professionals; clarifying and altering the distribution of certain fees and penalties; and clarifying the application of certain license requirements and penalties.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0030
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/18/2022
Legislative Date
11/18/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Board, Fees, and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2023
Legislative Date
1/13/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2023
Legislative Date
2/21/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2023
Legislative Date
2/21/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Board, Fees, and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/18/2022 11/18/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Board, Fees, and Penalties
Senate 1/13/2023 1/13/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/21/2023 2/21/2023 Favorable Adopted 30BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2023 2/21/2023 Second Reading Passed 30BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Board, Fees, and Penalties
Senate 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2023 2/24/2023 Referred Environment and Transportation 33AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2023 3/30/2023 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 3/29/2023 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page