Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland to act on behalf of the University System of Maryland and certain system institutions for the purpose of collective bargaining; requiring the Chancellor and the exclusive representative to negotiate the terms of one consolidated memorandum of understanding to apply to all bargaining units for employees of all system institutions represented by the exclusive representative; requiring a certain consolidated memorandum of understanding to include certain terms; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0486
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2020
Legislative Date
10/03/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Patterson) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {423423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (15-32)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494064/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-39)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2020 10/03/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Patterson) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {423423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (15-32) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Appropriations 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {494064/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (96-39) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
Last Updated: 5/11/2021 9:08 AM
Click to return on the top page