Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a municipal corporation to designate, by law, an area within that political subdivision as a tourism zone under certain circumstances; authorizing Baltimore City or a municipal corporation to exempt from the admissions and amusement tax gross receipts from certain admissions or amusement charges levied in a tourism zone; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1281
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2023
Legislative Date
10/30/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2024
Legislative Date
1/09/2024
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2023 10/30/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Senate 1/09/2024 1/09/2024 Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
(   18-401 through 18-403 )
(   9-268, 9-269 )
Last Updated: 2/9/2024 5:55 AM
Click to return on the top page