Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, rather than the Mayor and the President of the City Council of Baltimore City, to appoint the members of the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City with the advice and consent of the Senate; authorizing the Governor, rather than the Mayor and the President of the City Council of Baltimore City, to remove a member of the Board for certain infractions; requiring certain members of the Board to be residents of the City or to have served in City government for a minimum of 5 years immediately preceding the appointment; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1464
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/23/2023
Legislative Date
10/23/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253527/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Committee Amendment {253527/1 Adopted (30-14)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/23/2023 10/23/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Favorable with Amendments {253527/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Committee Amendment {253527/1 Adopted (30-14) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Reassigned to Economic Matters 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 7:57 PM
Click to return on the top page