Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Senator Brooks
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain qualifications for a journeyman license to provide heating, ventilation, air-conditioning, and refrigeration services to require having held an apprentice license for 4 rather than 3 years and having completed at least 6,000 rather than 1,875 hours of training under the direction and control of a licensed contractor.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0132
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/18/2022
Legislative Date
11/18/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2023
Legislative Date
1/15/2023
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2023
Legislative Date
2/10/2023
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/18/2022 11/18/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications
Senate 1/15/2023 1/15/2023 Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications
Senate 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2023 2/10/2023 Referred Economic Matters 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/15/2023 1:29 PM
Click to return on the top page