Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Transportation – Consolidated Transportation Program and Debt Limit of Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds (State and Federal Transportation Funding Act)
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the financial forecast that supports the Consolidated Transportation Program to include a reserve of $30,000,000 for changes in certain revenue sources; altering the calculation of the maximum amount of debt secured by future federal aid that the Department of Transportation may issue; providing that the maximum amount of debt that may be issued is calculated as of June 30; and providing that the proceeds from the issuance of certain debt may be used only for certain purposes.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0051
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/04/2022
Legislative Date
11/04/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2023
Legislative Date
1/12/2023
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/04/2022 11/04/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Department of Transportation – Consolidated Transportation Program and Debt Limit of Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds (State and Federal Transportation Funding Act)
Senate 1/12/2023 1/12/2023 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/31/2023 4:43 PM
Click to return on the top page