Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Carter
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (109-21)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the language of a provision of law requiring the expungement of certain records maintained by the State or a political subdivision of the State relating to the charging of certain offenses under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733524/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-21)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Favorable Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Referred Judiciary 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {733524/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (109-21) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/20/2022 7:56 AM
Click to return on the top page