Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsored by
Senator Carozza
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding Worcester County to the list of counties where an existing agricultural building used for agritourism is not considered a change of occupancy that requires a building permit if the subordinate use of agritourism does not require more than 200 people to occupy an individual building at any one time and the total width of means of egress meets or exceeds the International Building Code standard that applies to egress components other than stairways in a building without a sprinkler system.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0012
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/07/2021
Legislative Date
10/07/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/07/2021 10/07/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513128/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Text - Chapter - Worcester County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page