Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Requiring License to Practice and Other Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners to maintain on the Board's website an electronic roster of individuals registered and licensed to practice massage therapy; phasing out the option for an individual to be registered by the Board to practice massage therapy in a setting that is not a health care setting; altering the educational requirements for licensure or registration as a massage therapist to include 750 contact hours in a certain approved curriculum; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0220
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/20/2021
Legislative Date
9/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793421/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-16)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/20/2021 9/20/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Requiring License to Practice and Other Revisions
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments {873727/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Requiring License to Practice and Other Revisions
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {793421/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (117-16) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Requiring License to Practice and Other Revisions
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:57 AM
Click to return on the top page