Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods (REDEEM Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering the waiting periods applicable to the filing of petitions for expungement of convictions of certain crimes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0097
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/17/2022
Legislative Date
11/17/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343427/1
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343427/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/17/2022 11/17/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods (REDEEM Act of 2023)
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2023 3/02/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Favorable with Amendments {343427/1 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Favorable with Amendments {343427/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods (REDEEM Act of 2023)
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Judiciary 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/22/2023 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page