Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsored by
Senators West, Jackson, Kramer, and Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for longer than 30 minutes without access to continuous suitable shelter during extreme weather conditions or suitable shelter or suitable shade when temperatures are above 90 degrees Fahrenheit, subject to certain exceptions; defining "extreme weather conditions" as temperatures below 32 degrees Fahrenheit or conditions during an active winter or cold weather warning or advisory; making a violation of the Act a civil offense and applying certain penalties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0016
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0122 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2021
Legislative Date
10/15/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {733925/1 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-15)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2021 10/15/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Favorable 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Smith) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Floor Amendment {733925/1 (Senator West) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (120-15) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page