Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for certain costs, paid or incurred after July 1, 2022, by an owner of certain residential property for certain energy efficiency upgrades; requiring the owner to obtain a tax credit certificate from the Maryland Energy Administration; and prohibiting a taxpayer from claiming the tax credit for a taxable year during which the Governor declares a state of emergency.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0058
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0198 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2021
Legislative Date
10/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2021 10/27/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-754 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:08 PM
Click to return on the top page