Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - B-D-7 Licenses - Hours of Sale
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a geographic boundary in the 45th alcoholic beverages district of Baltimore City within which a holder of a B-D-7 beer, wine, and liquor license must operate in accordance with certain hours.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0335
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/03/2023
Legislative Date
9/03/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - B-D-7 Licenses - Hours of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - B-D-7 Licenses - Hours of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/03/2023 9/03/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - B-D-7 Licenses - Hours of Sale
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {803623/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - B-D-7 Licenses - Hours of Sale
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Economic Matters 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page