Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Corderman, Elfreth, Feldman, Klausmeier, Patterson, Salling, and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $7,500 to $10,000, the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred by an individual that are attributable to the individual's donation of an organ; altering the definition of "qualified expenses" for purposes of the subtraction modification to include unreimbursed expenses for child care, elder care, and medication; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0010
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0651 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/31/2020
Legislative Date
8/31/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/31/2020 8/31/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Referred Ways and Means 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 11:57 AM
Click to return on the top page