Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to coordinate the implementation of advance care planning programs in the State; requiring each health insurance carrier to offer electronic advance directives to its members and enrollees at certain times and make arrangements to receive certain notifications; and authorizing a health insurance carrier to contract with an electronic advance directives service under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0014
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0837 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 2/7/2022 12:01 PM
Click to return on the top page