Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Hettleman, Lee, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, and Watson
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 50
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement officer who takes a child into custody or charges a child with a criminal violation to provide actual notice to the child's parents, guardian, or custodian; requiring the notice to include the child's location, the reason for the custody action or charge, and instructions on how to make in-person contact; prohibiting the interrogation of a child by a law enforcement officer until the child has consulted with a certain attorney and a notice has been provided to the child's parents, guardian, or custodian; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0269
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0136 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/06/2021
Legislative Date
10/06/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683322/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-42)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Overridden (30-16)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Overridden (93-44)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 50
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/06/2021 10/06/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683322/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683322/1 Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Judiciary 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (91-42) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Overridden (30-16) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Overridden (93-44) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 50
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page