Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program - Nonprofit, Interest-Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2024 or fiscal year 2025 an appropriation of $1,000,000 to the Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program Fund to be used for loans under the Nonprofit, Interest-Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account; and repealing a requirement that 5% of proceeds from video lottery terminals go to the NIMBL Account.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0084
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0245 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/10/2022
Legislative Date
10/10/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2023
Legislative Date
1/10/2023
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/10/2022 10/10/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
Senate 1/10/2023 1/10/2023 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Favorable with Amendments {963225/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program - Nonprofit, Interest-Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account - Funding
Senate 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Referred Ways and Means 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 12:22 PM
Click to return on the top page