Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering the list of crimes included within a certain definition of "crime of violence" to include sexual abuse of a minor if the offender is at least 21 years old and the victim is under the age of 16 years; and requiring a sentence for certain persons convicted of certain sexual abuse crimes to include a term of lifetime sexual offender supervision.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0164
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0068 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2022
Legislative Date
9/16/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2022 9/16/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2023 3/30/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments {353226/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Senate 3/31/2023 3/21/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2023 3/20/2023 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/31/2023 1:08 PM
Click to return on the top page