Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use - Public Service Companies - Pollinator-Friendly Vegetation Management and Utility-Designated Pollinator Areas
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting local jurisdictions from imposing certain limitations and land use restrictions on utility-designated pollinator areas maintained by a public service company under certain conditions; requiring certain public service companies to mow utility-designated pollinator areas in a certain manner in order to minimize disturbances to habitats; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0062
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/09/2022
Legislative Date
11/09/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {953027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/09/2022 11/09/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Land Use – Public Service Companies – Pollinator–Friendly Vegetation Management
Senate 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 1/31 at 3:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2023 3/14/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Favorable with Amendments {953027/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Land Use - Public Service Companies - Pollinator-Friendly Vegetation Management and Utility-Designated Pollinator Areas
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Referred Economic Matters 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/21/2023 10:04 AM
Click to return on the top page