Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees - Membership Alterations and Appointment Requirements
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing by two members the membership of the Board of Community College Trustees for Anne Arundel County; and requiring the Governor to consider the geographic and ethnic representation of Anne Arundel County when making appointments to the Board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0327
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/08/2023
Legislative Date
8/08/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/08/2023 8/08/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees - Membership Alterations and Appointment Requirements
Senate 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees - Membership Alterations and Appointment Requirements
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Referred Appropriations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:10 PM
Click to return on the top page