Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Execution on a Judgment – Child Support Arrearages – Workers’ Compensation
Sponsored by
Senator Brooks
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that 25% of the net recovery by the debtor on a claim for workers' compensation is subject to execution on a judgment for a child support arrearage.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0650 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2022
Legislative Date
10/27/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2022 10/27/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Execution on a Judgment – Child Support Arrearages – Workers’ Compensation
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/31/2023 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page