Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis-Related Offenses - Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Substituting civil penalties in place of criminal penalties for certain offenses relating to possessing, possessing with the intent to distribute, and cultivating cannabis and manufacturing cannabis products.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0280
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/20/2022
Legislative Date
11/20/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Cannabis-Related Offenses - Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/20/2022 11/20/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Cannabis-Related Offenses - Civil Penalties
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/31/2023 6:49 PM
Click to return on the top page