Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teacher Degree Apprenticeship
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Teacher Apprenticeship Startup Grant Program in the Maryland Department of Labor to provide high school and college students and career changers opportunities to begin a career in education; requiring a sponsor particpating in a teacher apprenticeship program to establish of an apprenticeship that develops certain career paths and to pay apprentices certain compensation; authorizing the Department to award up to $225,000 to a sponsor to develop and launch a teacher apprenticeship program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0116
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0668 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/13/2023
Legislative Date
9/13/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Teacher Degree Apprenticeship
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2024
Legislative Date
1/11/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Teacher Degree Apprenticeship
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/13/2023 9/13/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Teacher Degree Apprenticeship
Senate 1/11/2024 1/11/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {613225/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Teacher Degree Apprenticeship
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page