Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Natural Resources – Lease Agreements – Trail Access Provision
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain leases executed by the Department of Natural Resources to include a provision requiring a lessee to maintain unobstructed access to trail heads by trail users and first responders and ensure that trail heads remain free of obstructions at all times; and requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to submit an annual report of the leases executed by the Department of Natural Resources to the Department of General Services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1395
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763625/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of Natural Resources – Lease Agreements – Trail Access Provision
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Natural Resources – Lease Agreements – Trail Access Provision
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {763625/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of Natural Resources – Lease Agreements – Trail Access Provision
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Text - Chapter - Department of Natural Resources – Lease Agreements – Trail Access Provision
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page