Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rifles and Shotguns – Possession – Age Requirement (Raise the Age Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the prohibition on selling, renting, or transferring certain ammunition to a person under the age of 21 years; prohibiting a person who is under the age of 21 years from possessing a rifle or shotgun except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/16/2022
Legislative Date
8/16/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/16/2022 8/16/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Rifles and Shotguns – Possession – Age Requirement (Raise the Age Act of 2023)
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 2/10/2023 8:35 AM
Click to return on the top page