Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Intersections – Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a vehicle facing a circular green signal, a green arrow signal, or a steady yellow signal from entering an intersection if the vehicle is unable to completely proceed through the intersection; providing certain exceptions; prohibiting a police officer from issuing a citation for a violation of the Act unless the approach to the intersection has certain signage installed notifying the public that a vehicle may not make a movement at the intersection that violates the provisions of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0137
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0311 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/19/2021
Legislative Date
10/19/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Intersections – Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/19/2021 10/19/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Intersections – Prohibited Acts
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page