Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Correctional Ombudsman in the Office of the Attorney General; requiring the Ombudsman to conduct investigations, reviews, and assessments of administrative acts taken by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services or in relation to individuals confined by the Department; requiring the Ombudsman to refer matters for criminal charges or disciplinary proceedings when appropriate; establishing the Correctional Ombudsman Advisory Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0064
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0512 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/18/2022
Legislative Date
11/18/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/18/2022 11/18/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
(   6-701 through 6-708 )
Last Updated: 2/10/2023 8:38 AM
Click to return on the top page