Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a licensed physician, physician assistant, or nurse practitioner work at least three rotations, with each rotation consisting of 100 hours of community-based clinical training in an area identified as having a health care workforce shortage, in order to qualify for a certain credit against the State income tax; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to issue a tax credit certificate for $1,000 for each student rotation for which certain persons served as preceptors without compensation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1252
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0788 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021, July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/26/2020
Legislative Date
10/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {389532/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {265061/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/26/2020 10/26/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {389532/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Ways and Means 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {265061/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:35 PM
Click to return on the top page