Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Animals - Retail Pet Stores and the Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "retail pet store" to include a broker that transfers dogs or cats for resale by another person for purposes of certain provisions of law regulating retail pet stores; clarifying a certain prohibition on the sale of cats or dogs by retail pet stores; establishing the Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards to examine canine breeding practices and make recommendations by December 1, 2021, for any legislative actions needed to create standards for persons selling dogs in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0625 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/9 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {213524/1 (Senator Hough)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {213524/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-33)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 5:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883894/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-31)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2021)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/9 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Floor Amendment {213524/1 (Senator Hough) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Floor Amendment {213524/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-33) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2021)
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Economic Matters 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Hearing 4/05 at 5:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {883894/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (106-31) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Domestic Animals - Retail Pet Stores and the Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards
Last Updated: 4/21/2021 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page