Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Use Disorder Assessment and Treatment
Sponsored by
Senators Lee and Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that a pregnant incarcerated individual be screened for substance use disorder at intake regardless of the jurisdiction or the length of the individual's sentence, be referred to health care providers, and be provided with certain medications and treatment; requiring a correctional unit to arrange for health insurance coverage and follow-up health care before release of a pregnant incarcerated individual; and requiring that a pregnant incarcerated individual be provided with medical records on release.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1120 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/28/2022
Legislative Date
9/28/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/28/2022 9/28/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Use Disorder Assessment and Treatment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2023 12:03 PM
Click to return on the top page