Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Kelly, Smith, Waldstreicher, Carter, McKay, Charles, Sydnor, West, Muse, Folden, and James
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from knowingly and with a certain intent soliciting a minor or law enforcement officer posing as a minor to engage in certain prohibited sexual acts with the minor by a certain means.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0099
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/26/2023
Legislative Date
10/26/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/26/2023 10/26/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography - Prohibition
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments {163721/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography - Prohibition
Senate 2/22/2024 2/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Referred Judiciary 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 8:04 AM
Click to return on the top page