Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction and Subsequent Offender Penalties - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a certain petition for expungement if the person is convicted of a certain misdemeanor involving driving while the person's license or privilege to drive is canceled, suspended, refused, or revoked; and providing that a person is subject to a certain enhanced penalty for a subsequent conviction for driving while the person's license or privilege to drive is canceled, suspended, refused, or revoked only in a certain circumstance.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0687 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/20/2020
Legislative Date
8/20/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-12)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/20/2020 8/20/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Conviction – Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {108275/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction and Subsequent Offender Penalties - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Judiciary 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (126-12) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction and Subsequent Offender Penalties - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:15 PM
Click to return on the top page