Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Newborn Screening Program - Krabbe Leukodystrophy
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the Maryland Department of Health's newborn screening system include screening for Krabbe leukodystrophy.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0096
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/12/2023
Legislative Date
10/12/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Newborn Screening Program - Krabbe Leukodystrophy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/12/2023 10/12/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health - Newborn Screening Program - Krabbe Leukodystrophy
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/16/2024 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page