Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Religious Group or Organization - Third-Party Leases
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that real property owned by a religious group or organization that is leased to a third party does not qualify for a certain property tax exemption and if only part of the real property is leased to a third party, only that part so leased does not qualify for the exemption.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0760 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2022
Legislative Date
11/01/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2023
Legislative Date
1/10/2023
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2022 11/01/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/10/2023 1/10/2023 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax Exemption - Religious Group or Organization - Third-Party Leases
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page