Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish, by October 1, 2021, a stakeholder advisory group to develop a reading and dyslexia handbook to guide local school systems in the implementation of best practices for early literacy and dyslexia; requiring a completed handbook be made available to the public by June 1, 2022; requiring the development of tools and materials to address the needs of at-risk and struggling students with dyslexia; requiring the Department to update the handbook every 3 years; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0237
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0575 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Age
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:52 PM
Click to return on the top page