Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Election Costs and Administration
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that each member of the State Board of Elections receive a stipend as provided in the State budget; requiring the State Administrator of Elections or the procurement officer for the State Board to disclose requests for proposals, invitations for bids, and proposed procurement contracts to the State Board; establishing requirements for invoices for payment sent by the State Board to a local board of elections and payments by a local board to the State Board; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/18/2023
Legislative Date
10/18/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Election Costs and Administration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/18/2023 10/18/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Election Law - Election Costs and Administration
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-201.1, 10-205,   2-101,   2-110, 2-111, 2-112, 2-203,   2-305,   9-106   )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page