Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to 2.25% the minimum rate a county shall impose on an individual's Maryland taxable income; requiring a county that imposes the county income tax on an income basis to set, by ordinance or resolution, certain income brackets; altering the calculation of a certain grant to certain counties under certain circumstances; prohibiting a county that imposes the county income tax on an income tax bracket basis from setting a minimum income tax rate less than 2.25%; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0319
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1494 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2020
Legislative Date
10/05/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {279239/1
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {723426/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Chisholm) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {793422/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (43-91)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-40)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2021
Legislative Date
5/28/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2020 10/05/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments {279239/1 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Committee Amendment Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Floor Amendment {723426/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (17-29) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Ways and Means 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Chisholm) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Floor Amendment {793422/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (43-91) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-40) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/28/2021 5/28/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 8/2/2021 12:10 PM
Click to return on the top page