Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to require that certain persons who provide battery-charged fence security systems comply with certain laws, require certain persons who operate or install certain security systems to obtain certain registrations or permits, require a certain installer to submit a certain affidavit, and conduct a certain inspection; authorizing a local government to issue a citation for noncompliance and impose a fine of $500 if a system is not made compliant; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/22/2020
Legislative Date
10/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423292/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-9)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/22/2020 10/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Economic Matters 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {423292/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (122-9) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page